U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Kims Kreations Inc v. Walt Disney Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Dismissing Case]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 06, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 25, 2015: [Order]
  • September 25, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 23, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 22, 2015: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 21, 2015: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.