U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin v. Sumner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • October 17, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • October 12, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 11, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Request for Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • February 17, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • February 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 17, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 03, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Response]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Vacate]
  • July 25, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 25, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • July 25, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • July 21, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 21, 2016: [Vacate]
  • July 21, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 21, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • July 21, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • July 20, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • July 20, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • July 19, 2016: [Entry of Default]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • May 03, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Response]
  • March 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 10, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 25, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 23, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2016: [Crossclaim]
  • January 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 19, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.