U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Larson v. Larson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 06, 2016: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • July 05, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 05, 2016: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 05, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • June 20, 2016: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • June 17, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 17, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 17, 2016: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement]
  • May 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 20, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 12, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • May 11, 2016: [Errata]
  • May 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order]
  • May 04, 2016: [Protective Order]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • April 01, 2016: [Reply]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2016: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2016: [Enforce Settlement Agreement]
  • March 17, 2016: [Response]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Reply to Response]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 24, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 10, 2016: [Enforce Settlement Agreement]
  • February 01, 2016: [Status Report]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 25, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • September 18, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 17, 2015: [Opposition]
  • September 14, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 11, 2015: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 03, 2015: [Removal]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 01, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.