U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Hartbank v. Weaver
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 12, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 05, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 20, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 19, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • July 06, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • June 21, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • January 11, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 19, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 09, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.