U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Neufer v. Sweetwater County Sheriff's Office Detective et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Objection]
  • April 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Show Cause]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
  • January 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 21, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2016: [Response]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [Praecipe]
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.