U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:07-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Aleman-Blanco v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.