U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Casper Inn LLC v. Superior Builders Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Reply Brief]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 27, 2017: [Response]
  • June 26, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 23, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 21, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • June 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2017: [Brief]
  • June 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Setting Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Vacating Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • June 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • June 02, 2017: [In Limine]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 19, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 16, 2016: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2016: [Vacate]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [~Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 07, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 18, 2016: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 08, 2016: [Acceptance of Service]
  • April 07, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • April 07, 2016: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • April 05, 2016: [Add Party]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 08, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 16, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • February 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • January 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.