U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Mares v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Exhibit List]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 01, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 12, 2016: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 08, 2016: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2016: [In Court Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Setting Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • March 21, 2016: [Response]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • February 02, 2016: [Lift Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.