U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Employers Mutual Casualty Company v. X-It Construction LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 31, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 30, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 18, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • August 18, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 09, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 22, 2016: [Mail Returned]
  • July 05, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • June 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 14, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 19, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 17, 2016: [Response]
  • May 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.