U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Energy Drilling LLC v Virtus Oil and Gas Corp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 06, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • November 05, 2019: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Status Report Order]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Status Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Status Report Order]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Status Report]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Status Report Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Status Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Status Report Order]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Status Report]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Status Report Order]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Martinez Report]
  • November 22, 2017: [Status Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Status Report Order]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Status Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Status Report Order]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Status Report]
  • May 16, 2017: [Status Report Order]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Status Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • April 25, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 01, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.