U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Cor v. Sinclair Services Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 16, 2016: [Response]
  • June 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • June 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.