U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Medina-Gonzalez v. Hillhouse et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 06, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • May 02, 2016: [Jury Demand]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • April 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.