U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Parkhurst v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Letter(s)]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [USCA Order]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 25, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 16, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 05, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 05, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 05, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.