U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Long-Underwood et al v. Keyhole Technologies LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 28, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 23, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Statement]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Response]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2019: [Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • May 14, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 08, 2019: [Opposition]
  • May 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 06, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • May 01, 2019: [In Limine]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 17, 2019: [Response]
  • April 17, 2019: [Opposition]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 03, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • April 03, 2019: [Bifurcate]
  • April 03, 2019: [Opposition]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Strike]
  • March 20, 2019: [Brief]
  • March 20, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 12, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Witness List]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 16, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 10, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 03, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Statement]
  • May 24, 2018: [Statement]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Status Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • June 27, 2017: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • June 22, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Financial Entry]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • February 16, 2017: [Setting Hearing]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Strike]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 09, 2016: [Consolidating Case]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 29, 2016: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 08, 2016: [Praecipe]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 10, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Complaint]
  • May 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.