U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Farnsworth-Russell v. Farnsworth Allen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • July 14, 2017: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 03, 2017: [Brief]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Status Conference]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • November 11, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • October 07, 2016: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • October 07, 2016: [Counterclaim]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 16, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 12, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 15, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 02, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Praecipe]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.