U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Golden v. Sheridan County District Court et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 16, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2016: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 10, 2016: [Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 19, 2016: [Response]
  • October 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Reply]
  • September 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 09, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.