U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Padilla v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Response]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 25, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2016: [Response]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • September 09, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.