U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00232
  • Case Name: VonWeller v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Mail Returned]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 13, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Objection]
  • January 18, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • January 18, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Protective Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 27, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 06, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 12, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 18, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.