U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Fish et al v. Big Spring Spa, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2018: [Dismiss]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 20, 2018: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • March 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 15, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 13, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 07, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 05, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2018: [Reply]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Objection]
  • February 23, 2018: [Opposition]
  • February 23, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • February 16, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 16, 2018: [Witness List]
  • February 16, 2018: [Strike]
  • February 16, 2018: [Opposition]
  • February 14, 2018: [Supplement]
  • February 12, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • February 12, 2018: [Response]
  • February 12, 2018: [Reply]
  • February 05, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [In Limine]
  • February 02, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 29, 2018: [Objection]
  • January 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 29, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • January 17, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 17, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 04, 2018: [Strike]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 21, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 21, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 11, 2017: [Quash]
  • December 08, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • October 03, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 15, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Protective Order]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 27, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 18, 2017: [Opposition]
  • July 18, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • June 30, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 22, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Quash]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 19, 2017: [Quash]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • February 22, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 09, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 03, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 09, 2016: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • November 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 03, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.