U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00275
  • Case Name: Renner v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 13, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Minute Order]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 06, 2017: [Stay Case]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 08, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.