U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00310
  • Case Name: Century Surety Company v. Lang Homes Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 19, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 18, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.