U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Bonner et al v. Simpson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 26, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 12, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Strike]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 01, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 30, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 24, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 16, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • June 15, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • June 01, 2017: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • May 08, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 03, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • May 02, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.