U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Wilcox et al v. Grand Targhee Resort LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • May 11, 2018: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 01, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [In Limine]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2018: [In Limine]
  • April 13, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • March 07, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • February 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 21, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 15, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 14, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • January 12, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Protective Order]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 13, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 04, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 05, 2017: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • April 03, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.