U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Craft et al v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Reply]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response]
  • July 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 10, 2018: [Response]
  • July 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 06, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 12, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • June 12, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 30, 2018: [Vacate]
  • May 30, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • May 23, 2018: [Lift Stay]
  • May 14, 2018: [Status Report Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Status Report Order]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • July 24, 2017: [Reply]
  • July 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 03, 2017: [Stay Case]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • June 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.