U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Werner v. Johnson County Sheriff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Letter(s)]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 06, 2017: [Financial Entry]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • June 20, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • June 13, 2017: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.