U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Curry v. Cyclone Drilling Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 21, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 10, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 06, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • May 16, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 10, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Response]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 09, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • February 06, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 02, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 01, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 31, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 04, 2018: [Errata]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • December 12, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 21, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 15, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 15, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 18, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 30, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 29, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.