U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:92-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Spencer
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 28, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 08, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Response]
  • April 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • March 13, 2020: [Set Aside]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Mandate]
  • March 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • January 05, 2018: [Response]
  • January 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • January 02, 2018: [Letter(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 28, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 28, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 20, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • December 11, 2017: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • December 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 06, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 27, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 21, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 01, 2017: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.