U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00160
  • Case Name: First Interstate Bank v. Albright, Becker & Stoddard, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 13, 2018: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Minute Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Response]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 26, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Acceptance of Service]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 24, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • October 16, 2017: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 16, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.