U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Thatcher et al v. Faleafine et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 08, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 01, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 05, 2020: [Response]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 28, 2020: [Vacate]
  • April 27, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [Response]
  • April 13, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 11, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • March 11, 2020: [Witness List]
  • March 11, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 28, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • February 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • February 04, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • February 04, 2020: [Compel]
  • February 04, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 29, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2019: [Vacate]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 08, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 14, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • October 25, 2018: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • October 10, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • September 10, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 07, 2018: [Sanctions]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • August 22, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 22, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Status Conference]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Staying Case]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Transcript]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2018: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2018: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 02, 2018: [Reply Brief]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 02, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 13, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 13, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • December 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • October 02, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.