U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Daivs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • May 03, 2018: [Brief]
  • May 03, 2018: [Default Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 18, 2018: [Entry of Default]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Praecipe]
  • January 08, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.