U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Muller v. Black Hills Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 08, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 05, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • March 05, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 01, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.