U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Cohen et al v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 23, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 26, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 11, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 14, 2018: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 16, 2018: [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.