U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Colton v. Dubois Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 26, 2018: [Hearing - Dispositive]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Brief]
  • August 13, 2018: [Opposition]
  • August 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Brief]
  • July 30, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.