U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Childress v. Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 11, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • January 07, 2019: [Substitute Party]
  • January 03, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 22, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 17, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 04, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 22, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.