U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Woodward et al v. Chesapeak Operating LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 23, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • March 10, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 09, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 06, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 20, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 16, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • January 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • November 18, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 16, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 21, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 07, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 24, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 16, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 09, 2018: [Financial Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.