U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Maxwell et al v. Dahl
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 18, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 03, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Pretrial Memorandum]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 08, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 25, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 11, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.