U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00176
  • Case Name: King v. Prairie Field Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 25, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 13, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Protective Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 26, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 14, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 06, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.