U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Price v. Halliburton Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Opposition]
  • January 21, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 21, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • January 20, 2020: [Statement]
  • January 20, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 20, 2020: [Proposed Verdict]
  • January 17, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 17, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Objection]
  • January 17, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 17, 2020: [Proposed Verdict]
  • January 17, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 14, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 13, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 10, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 19, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • November 06, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 24, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 09, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • August 16, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 21, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • December 21, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 11, 2018: [Jury Demand]
  • December 11, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 11, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2018: [Acceptance of Service]
  • December 04, 2018: [Praecipe]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 02, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.