U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Moon v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Case Transferred to MDL Panel]
  • December 27, 2018: [Minute Order]
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 21, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • December 03, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.