U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Stambaugh et al v. Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 29, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 07, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 06, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 06, 2020: [Proposed Verdict]
  • January 03, 2020: [Exhibit List]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 18, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • December 12, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.