U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Rohrbacher v. Teton Therapy PC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 10, 2019: [Opposition]
  • December 06, 2019: [In Limine]
  • December 06, 2019: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 06, 2019: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 26, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • November 18, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 29, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 16, 2019: [Witness List]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 13, 2019: [Witness List]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Financial Entry]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 30, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 23, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 23, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.