U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Staples v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 19, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 02, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 24, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 04, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Return of Subpoena]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 14, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 22, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 17, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Financial Entry]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 20, 2018: [Complaint]
  • December 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.