U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Standish et al v. Jackson Hole Mountain Resort Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 12, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 12, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 11, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 31, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 30, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Supplement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 02, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 02, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 28, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 28, 2020: [Witness List]
  • February 18, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Amended Motion]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Vacate]
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • September 16, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 16, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.