U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Walker v. Taz-Ag Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 22, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • April 21, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Witness List]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2020: [Consolidating Case]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 24, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Intervene]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Scheduling Conference]
  • May 04, 2020: [Vacate]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • December 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 06, 2019: [Show Cause]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 28, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 22, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 22, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 08, 2019: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 08, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • April 05, 2019: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • April 01, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2019: [Intervene]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 04, 2019: [Financial Entry]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 26, 2019: [Crossclaim]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 22, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.