U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Rimex Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 17, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 17, 2021: [In Limine]
  • December 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • December 16, 2021: [In Limine]
  • December 13, 2021: [Mediation]
November, 2021
  • November 13, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Opposition]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 19, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • October 13, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • October 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 21, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • September 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 29, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2021: [Compel]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 05, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 28, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 14, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 18, 2020: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • November 09, 2020: [USCA Order]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • December 31, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 13, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • December 13, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 12, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 12, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 05, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 05, 2019: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • December 03, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 03, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • December 02, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 02, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 22, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • July 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • July 03, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • June 24, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • June 19, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 17, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • June 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 24, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder-Non-Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2019: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 08, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 01, 2019: [Opposition]
  • April 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2019: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 15, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 15, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 08, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • March 05, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 04, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 27, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 26, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.