U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Bastrom v. Paxiao
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 23, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [Brief]
  • January 03, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 29, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 22, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Witness List]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Protective Order]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 20, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • June 20, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 19, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 15, 2019: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 15, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 08, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 25, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • March 25, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 25, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 25, 2019: [Crossclaim]
  • March 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 07, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 07, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 07, 2019: [Counterclaim]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.