U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Tucker-Collins v. J&E Oilfield Service LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 16, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Disqualify]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.