U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Trinity Teen Solutions Inc v. United Behavioral Health
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 03, 2019: [Reconsideration]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Remand]
  • March 25, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2019: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 15, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 08, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 04, 2019: [Removal]
  • March 04, 2019: [Complaint]
  • March 01, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.