U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Frey v. Jackson WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Brief]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 22, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • May 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 15, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 13, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 11, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • May 11, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 21, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 16, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • April 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Supplement]
  • March 05, 2020: [Exhibits]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • January 16, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • January 14, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • January 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Errata]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • January 06, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 06, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 02, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 30, 2019: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 30, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 13, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • October 18, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • October 17, 2019: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 01, 2019: [Reply Brief]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • September 24, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 17, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 20, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 19, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 05, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 17, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • June 14, 2019: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 13, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 12, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 11, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 03, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • May 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Joinder]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 27, 2019: [Objection]
  • May 23, 2019: [Stay Discovery]
  • May 20, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 13, 2019: [Reply Brief]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 29, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 12, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 08, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 27, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 20, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.