U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Goetzel v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 23, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 23, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 20, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 20, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 20, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 24, 2019: [Response]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 16, 2019: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 09, 2019: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 02, 2019: [Financial Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.